Strain Jr. et al v. East Baton Rouge Parish School Board et al
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Ray, Donald A. Strain Jr., Fran S. Bolton and Scott O. Strain
Defendant: National Maintenance Holding Company, LLC, ExxonMobil Corporation, Anco Insulations, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, The McCarty Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Dow Chemical Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Jacobs Engineering Group Inc., General Electric Company, Cargill, Incorporated, Reilly-Benton Co., Inc., East Baton Rouge Parish School Board, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Viacom, Inc., Akzo Nobel Salt, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and K&B Louisiana Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00253
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (NLT)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to #18 Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention, filed by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(EDC)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Opposition to Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 24-1 through 24-16 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6-24-2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23)(LaMarca, Kevin). Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 6/24/2019 (EDC).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 and #22 Motions for Sam E. Taylor, II and Kevin P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Kevin P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952689). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Sam E. Taylor II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952668). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Kevin P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952689) by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gettys, Lawrence)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Sam E. Taylor II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952668) by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gettys, Lawrence)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Recent Court Decisions by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Gettys, Lawrence)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Notice/Order Denying Transfer to the JPML Panel. (SWE)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(ELW)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk of court shall file R. Docs. 16-1 through 16-9 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 31, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Opposition, #3 Exhibit 2 to Proposed Opposition, #4 Exhibit 3 to Proposed Opposition, #5 Exhibit 4 to Proposed Opposition, #6 Exhibit 5 to Proposed Opposition, #7 Exhibit 6 to Proposed Opposition, #8 Exhibit 7 to Proposed Opposition, #9 Exhibit 8 to Proposed Opposition, #10 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Previously Filed Answer by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Benach, Carlos) Modified on 5/23/2019 (NLT).
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Abstention by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. re #8 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Abstention (Gettys, Lawrence)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention filed by All Plaintiffs. (ELW)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention in Excess of the Page Limitation. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 9-1 into the record. The clerk is further directed to STRIKE R. Docs. 8-1 and 8-2 as they were improperly filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #9 Motion to Remand, good cause exists to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELED. Not status report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention in Excess of the Page Limitation, #8 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Abstention. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention in Excess of the Page Limitation by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(KAH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Attachments: # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD (1) Attachment Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limitation, # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD (2) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention, #3 Exhibit 1 - Composite of 37 Remand Orders, #4 Exhibit 2 - Diagnosing Medical, #5 Exhibit 3 - Death Certificate, #6 Exhibit 4 - Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit 5 - Agreed Motion for Continuance, #8 Exhibit 6 - Status Conference Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 7 - J&Js RFA Responses at RFA no. 12, #10 Exhibit 8 - Imerys Demand Letter)(Gettys, Lawrence). Added MOTION on 5/10/2019 (KAH). Modified on 5/10/2019 to edit the text (KAH). Modified on 5/14/2019 STRICKEN as ordered by rec doc # 11 (ELW).
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS RULE 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT UPON REMOVAL by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Gettys, Lawrence)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. responsive pleadings due 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/01/2019. (ELW)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) Modified on 5/2/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Thomas L. Cougill who is lead counsel for party Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 646985. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933036), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4 - State Court Record, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5 - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6 - State Court Record, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7 - State Court Record, #8 Exhibit A - Part 8 - State Court Record, #9 Exhibit A - Part 9 - State Court Record, #10 Exhibit A - Part 10 - State Court Record, #11 Exhibit A - Part 11 - State Court Record, #12 Exhibit A - Part 12 - State Court Record, #13 Exhibit A - Part 13 - State Court Record, #14 Exhibit A - Part 14 - State Court Record, #15 Exhibit A - Part 15 - State Court Record, #16 Exhibit A - Part 16 - State Court Record, #17 Exhibit A - Part 17 - State Court Record, #18 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #19 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #20 Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #21 Exhibit B - Part 4 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #22 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Benach, Carlos) (Attachment 6, 7 and 15 replaced on 4/29/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strain Jr. et al v. East Baton Rouge Parish School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Maintenance Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Katie Dampier Chabert
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Represented By: Jamie Morain Zanovec
Represented By: Jennifer Hart McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School Board
Represented By: Annette N. Peltier
Represented By: Brittany Holt Alexander
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Barbara Lee Arras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Salt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: William Glenn Burns
Represented By: John Dennis Person
Represented By: Lezly L. Petrovich
Represented By: Omar K. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Kyle W. Siegel
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Ray
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Kevin James LaMarca
Represented By: Kevin P. Parker
Represented By: Sam E. Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Strain Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Kevin James LaMarca
Represented By: Kevin P. Parker
Represented By: Sam E. Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran S. Bolton
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Kevin James LaMarca
Represented By: Kevin P. Parker
Represented By: Sam E. Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott O. Strain
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Kevin James LaMarca
Represented By: Kevin P. Parker
Represented By: Sam E. Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?