Jones v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Jones
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00255
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Brenda Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Stay Status Report Deadline. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELLED. No Status Report is required at this time. The parties shall contact the chambers of the undersigned at (225) 389-3602 upon a resolution of the Motion to Remand should a scheduling conference need to be set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Joint MOTION to Stay June 25, 2019 Status Report Deadline [Rec. Doc. 7] by Plaintiff and. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay June 25, 2019 Status Report Deadline [Rec. Doc. 7] by Plaintiff and by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 6/25/2019 (SGO).
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment)(ELW)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Oral Argument at this time. Should the court later determine that oral argument is necessary, a separate order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. R. Doc. 14-1 and attachments shall be entered into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 6/13/2019 to create relationship (LT).
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Brenda Jones. (EDC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand filed by Brenda Jones. The Memorandum [9-1] shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
May 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand , , #10 MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Sossamon, Meera)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Brenda Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand by Brenda Jones. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Brenda Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. are granted an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days, or until 5/23/2019, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Benach, Carlos)
May 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Lindsey A Cheek regarding Bridget B. Truxillo and Rubi L. Brown who are Co-Counsel for party Brenda Jones. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-678343. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933098), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #4 Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #5 Exhibit B - Part 4 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Benach, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan D Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey J Siemann
Represented By: Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jones
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?