Cole v. The Prudential Insurance Co. of America
Plaintiff: Shonda Cole
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The and The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00257
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 3, 2019 Notice of Payment of $100.00 Pro Hac Vice Fee by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ALAMDC-1965132. (Kenny, Erin)
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll James C. Goodfellow as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kenny, Erin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for James C. Goodfellow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kenny, Erin) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit the event type (NLT).
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Shonda Cole. (Estill, Alice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Kenny, Erin)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The Prudential Insurance Company of America is granted an extension of time of twenty one (21) days, or until 7/3/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kenny, Erin) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933256.), filed by Shonda Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Verification, #3 Summons)(Estill, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. The Prudential Insurance Co. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Represented By: Amy Collier Lambert
Represented By: Erin Sayes Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonda Cole
Represented By: Alice Estill
Represented By: G. Allen Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?