USAA Life Insurance Company v. Pourciau et al
Plaintiff: USAA Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffre Pourciau, Porurciau Family Irrevocable Trust, Brent Pourciau, Rene Pourciau Johnson and Richard L Pourciau, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00259
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendants having not made and appearance, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 8/29/2019 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.). (BLR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT by USAA Life Insurance Company. (Morrison, Emily)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (SWE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against Rene Pourciau Johnson, Porurciau Family Irrevocable Trust, Jeffre Pourciau, Richard L Pourciau, Jr, Brent Pourciau ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933671.), filed by USAA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nieset, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA Life Insurance Company v. Pourciau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffre Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porurciau Family Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Pourciau Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Pourciau, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James R. Nieset, Jr.
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?