Mackey v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marjorie B Mackey
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. Upon resolution of the Motion to Remand, counsel shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. at (225) 389-3602 should a scheduling conference need to be set. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Marjorie Mackey and by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order of Remand)(Chassaignac, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is granted an extension of twenty-one (21) days, or until 5/28/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
May 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Chassaignac, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of Parites and Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-681163. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935034), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Attorney Demand, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackey v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie B Mackey
Represented By: Aub A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?