Aleem v. Cenikor Foundation
Plaintiff: Malik Aleem, Avia Chouest, Roderic Brown, Wesley Guillard, Marlon Woods, Donald Veuleman, Amanda Costello, Ryan Freemin, Christopher Cross, Stephen Cheatham, Rodney Carlson, Ronald Franklin, Ivan McKinney, Ivery Handy, Cody Alaniz, Tina Fruge Stallard, Matthew Vincent, Shane Yongue, Jose Martinez, Christopher Harrison, Joy Sullivan, Sean Battiste, Christopher Payne, Joan Manuel Velasquez, Alana Whatley, Joey Primeaux, Russell Johnson, Jessica Fairris, Brandi Porretto, Emmanuel Mauldin, Ronald Rhone, Calvin Green, Krystle Jackson, Chase Danereau, Corey Ayo, Ernie Martin, Christopher Stephney, Candice Adams and Dwayne Dunn
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation and Cenikor Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00268
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Change Venue to First-to-File Court by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Knapp, Bradley)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Richard A. Chopin is added as co-counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 37 Joint STATUS REPORT by Malik Aleem. (Stiegler, Charles)
June 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #36 MOTION to Enroll Richard A. Chopin as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Enroll Richard A. Chopin as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chopin, Justin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent of C. Payne)(Stiegler, Charles)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The Civil Action Nos. 19-cv-267, 19-cv-268 and 19-cv-294 are set for a Status Conference on 7/1/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/19/2019. (EDC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent form of J. Martinez, #2 Consent Form of T. Fruge)(Stiegler, Charles)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion to Designate Lead Attorney. Attorney David Gregory shall be designated as lead attorney for this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition to #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification filed by Malik Aleem. (Stiegler, Charles) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 Request to Clarify Court Order or, in the Alternative, Renewed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gregory, David). Added MOTION for Reconsideration on 6/19/2019 (KMW). Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit the motion text(KMW).
June 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Gregory, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cenikor Foundation, Inc..(Gregory, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gregory, David)
May 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court notes the above captioned matters all include Fair Labor Standards Act claims by similarly situated Plaintiffs who attended Defendant's residential rehabilitation facility. Considering Local Rule 3(b), all civil matters, which involve subject matter that comprises all or a material part of the subject matter or cooperative facts of another action, shall be transferred to the section with the lowest docket number. Civil Case Number 3:19-00268-JWD-RLB is transferred from Judge John W. deGravelles to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, Civil Case Number 3:19-00294-SDD-RLB is transferred from Judge Shelly D. Dick to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, the #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer Motion in Civil Case Number 3:19-00267-BAJ-RLB is GRANTED and Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion is extended through 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2019. (SWE)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Consent of R. Rhone by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent form of R. Rhone)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Expedited Consideration (Doc. 23) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer Motion for Conditional Certification is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.The motion is granted in that Defendant is given a fourteen (14) day extension in which to file its answer.Prior to the expiration of that deadline, Defendant may either move for a further extension of time, seek a status conference, and/or file a Joint Stipulation as it did inSorey v. Cenikor Foundation, No. 19-267-BAJ-RLB (M.D. La.). Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 05/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #20 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #20 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (SWE)
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 Exhibit(s) to #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Malik Aleem. (Stiegler, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification filed by Malik Aleem. (Stiegler, Charles)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #8 MOTION for Conditional Certification by Cenikor Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent Form of C. Harrison, #2 Consent Form of J. Velasquez, #3 Consent Form of A. Whatley, #4 Consent Form of B. Porretto, #5 Consent Form of M. Vincent, #6 Consent Form of J. Sullivan, #7 Consent Form of C. Stephney, #8 Consent Form of J. Fairis)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for David Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Gregory, Christopher Dove, Andrew Reed and Frank Sommerville are hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant Cenikor Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Ex Parte Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Cenikor Foundation is granted a 21-day extension of time until and including 6/13/2019 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946539), #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946557). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946557) by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946539) by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Ex Parte MOTION for David Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945755). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945766) by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit docket text (KMW).
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945755) by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit docket text (KMW).
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Cenikor Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Malik Aleem (Stiegler, Charles)
May 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 C. Ayo Consent Form, #2 C. Cross Consent Form)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 S. Yongue Consent Form, #2 A. Costello Consent Form, #3 C. Danereau Consent Form, #4 R. Carlson Consent Form, #5 S. Battiste Consent Form)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Conditional Certification by Malik Aleem. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of M. Aleem, #3 Affidavit of Opt-In Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit Secretary of State Records, #5 Proposed Pleading; Notice to Members of the Collective)(Stiegler, Charles) Modified on 5/14/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent form of D. Veuleman, #2 Consent Form of R. Fremin, #3 Consent Form of S. Cheatham)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent form of Avia Chouest, #2 Consent Form of Dwayne Dunn, #3 Consent Form of Joey Primeaux, #4 Consent form of Marlon Woods, #5 Consent Form of Roderic Brown, #6 Consent Form of Russell Johnson)(Stiegler, Charles) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/9/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE).
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join Action by Malik Aleem (Attachments: #1 Consent Form of Ivan McKinney, #2 Consent Form of Cody Alaniz, #3 Consent Form of Calvin Green, #4 Consent Form of Candice Adams, #5 Consent Form of Emmanuel Mauldin, #6 Consent Form of George Orstendorf, #7 Consent Form of Ivery Handy, #8 Consent form of James Sykes, #9 Consent Form of Krystle Jackson, #10 Consent Form of Ronald Franklin, #11 Consent Form of Wesley Guillard, #12 Consent Form of Ernie Martin)(Stiegler, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malik Aleem. All Defendants. (Stiegler, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cenikor Foundation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenikor Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935625.), filed by Malik Aleem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Consent to Join by M. Aleem)(Stiegler, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aleem v. Cenikor Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Aleem
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avia Chouest
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderic Brown
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Guillard
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Woods
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Veuleman
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Costello
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Freemin
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cross
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Cheatham
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Carlson
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Franklin
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan McKinney
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivery Handy
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Alaniz
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Fruge Stallard
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Vincent
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Yongue
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Harrison
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Sullivan
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Battiste
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Payne
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Manuel Velasquez
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Whatley
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Primeaux
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Johnson
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fairris
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Porretto
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Mauldin
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rhone
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Green
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Jackson
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Danereau
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Ayo
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Martin
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stephney
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Adams
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Dunn
Represented By: Richard A. Chopin
Represented By: Justin M. Chopin
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Paul Babineaux
Represented By: David Gregory
Represented By: Omer Frederick Kuebel, III
Represented By: Bradley Clay Knapp
Represented By: Andrew W. Reed
Represented By: Karen Bordelon
Represented By: Chris Dove
Represented By: Frank Sommerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?