Addison v. Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon

Plaintiff: Mary A. Addison
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00273
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Mary A. Addison. (Babin, Carl)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Susannah Marie DeNicola for Mary A. Addison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Enroll Susannah M. DeNicola as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Enroll Susannah M. DeNicola as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Babin, Carl)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (SWE)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon.(Beckman, Kristin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon. (Beckman, Kristin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon (Beckman, Kristin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C681236, Sec. 21-D. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1936651), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Beckman, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Addison
Represented By: Carl Edward Babin
Represented By: Susannah Marie DeNicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Kristin L. Beckman
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Laura Carolyn Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?