Wesley v. Ascension Parish et al

Plaintiff: Taleta Wesley
Defendant: Donald (Don) Hysell, Ascension Parish, Kenneth (Kenny) Matassa, Kenneth (Ken) Dawson, Kenneth Matassa, Kenneth Dawson, Parish of Ascension and Donald Hysell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00276
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Taleta Wesley. Kenneth Dawson waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Donald Hysell waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Kenneth Matassa waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Parish of Ascension waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Fiffie, Vercell)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleadings and Motion to Substitute. The Clerk of Court shall strike R. Doc. 2. The Complaint filed as R. Doc. 3 will be considered the operative complaint. The Clerk shall also substitute the signed civil cover sheet, R. Doc. 5, in the place of the unsigned version, R. Doc. 4 at page 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (EDC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Dawson, Donald Hysell, Kenneth Matassa, Parish of Ascension. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(EDC)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (EDC)
May 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleadings MOTION to Substitute iwth Previously Filed Pleadings for Same. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleadings and Substitute with Previously filed Pleadings for Same by Taleta Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiffie, Vercell). Added MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document on 5/13/2019 (SWE). Modified on 5/13/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit(s) to #4 Exhibit(s) by Taleta Wesley. (Fiffie, Vercell)
May 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet to #3 Complaint by Taleta Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Right to Sue Letter)(Fiffie, Vercell) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/7/2019) (ELW). Modified on 5/7/2019 to flatten document and edit text (ELW) Modified on 5/23/2019 to replace as per rec doc 10 (KAH).
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT Updated against All Defendants, filed by Taleta Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons - Donald Hysell, #2 Attachment Summons - Kenneth Dawson, #3 Attachment Summons - Parish of Ascension, #4 Attachment Summons - Kenneth Matassa)(Fiffie, Vercell) (Attachment 1-4 replaced on 5/7/2019) (ELW). Modified on 5/7/2019 to flatten documents (ELW).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Taleta Wesley. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment Summons - Donald Hysell, # 3 Attachment Summons - Kenneth Dawson, # 4 Attachment Summons - Parish of Ascension, # 5 Attachment Summons - Kenneth Dawson)(Fiffie, Vercell) Modified on 5/23/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 10 (KAH).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Taleta Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiffie, Vercell) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/7/2019) (ELW). Modified on 5/7/2019 to flatten document (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. Ascension Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taleta Wesley
Represented By: Vercell Fergus Fiffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald (Don) Hysell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth (Kenny) Matassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth (Ken) Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Matassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Ascension
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hysell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?