Investar Bank v. StarNet Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Investar Bank
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Co and StarNet Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00280
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER With Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by StarNet Insurance Company.(Barker, Lori) Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/09/2019. (ELW)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investar Bank. StarNet Insurance Company served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Stern, Charles)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to StarNet Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Starnet Insurance Co ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938216.), filed by Investar Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5A, #8 Exhibit 5B, #9 Exhibit 5C, #10 Exhibit 5D, #11 Exhibit 5E, #12 Exhibit 5F, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7A, #15 Exhibit 7B, #16 Exhibit 7C, #17 Exhibit 8, #18 Exhibit 9, #19 Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit 17, #27 Exhibit 18)(Stern, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Investar Bank v. StarNet Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StarNet Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori D. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Investar Bank
Represented By: Charles L. Stern, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan M. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?