Schexnayder v. Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan, et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Schexnayder
Defendant: Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan, United Medical Resources, Inc. and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00282
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Robert W. Rachal,Sarah Katelyn Harrell for Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION to Enroll Robert W. Rachal and Katelyn Harrell as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Enroll Robert W. Rachal and Katelyn Harrell as Additional Attorney by Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time with Expedited consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 06/26/2019. (ELW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , for Failure to State a Claim by UMR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(King, Errol) Modified on 6/24/2019 to edit text (LT).
June 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of the ERISA Case Order Deadlines MOTION for Expedited Hearing. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, in globo, #13 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of the ERISA Case Order Deadlines by Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Shirley, Melissa). Added MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 6/24/2019 (SWE). Modified on 6/24/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, With Request for Expedited Consideration. Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan Responsive Pleadings due June 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings, With Request for Expedited Consideration by Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Shirley, Melissa)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ERISA Case Order: In order to facilitate an efficient progression of this action, the parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (KAH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan, UMR, Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938251.), filed by Brandon Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons.Franciscan, #3 Attachment Summons.UMR)(Sprague, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schexnayder v. Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Schexnayder
Represented By: Jeremiah Sprague
Represented By: Timothy J. Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Benefit Plan
Represented By: Melissa M. Shirley
Represented By: Sarah Katelyn Harrell
Represented By: Robert W. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Medical Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Errol J. King, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel P. Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?