Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Comarda, et al

Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Gregory K Miller, Anne Broussard Comarda, Mary Elizabeth Fahey and Julie Allison Steigleder
Case Number: 3:2019cv00285
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Anne Broussard Comarda, Mary Elizabeth Fahey, Julie Allison Steigleder (Comarda, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Gregory K Miller waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Julie Allison Steigleder waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Lawrence, Jennifer) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Anne Broussard Comarda waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Lawrence, Jennifer) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Mary Elizabeth Fahey waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Lawrence, Jennifer) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Deposit Funds by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938703.), filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawrence, Jennifer) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/8/2019 to flatten the document) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Comarda, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Broussard Comarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Allison Steigleder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Lawrence
Represented By: Krystil Borrouso Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?