BLAI, LLC v. Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Plaintiff: BLAI, LLC
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00291
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of the Order (R. Doc. 5) granting an extension of the answer deadline and the #6 Answer having been filed 7/1/2019, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 9:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 8/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc..(Bodin, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion and Order for Extension of Time. Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.'s deadline to file responsive pleadings is extended to 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Bodin, Gregory) Modified on 6/5/2019 (SGO).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1939625.), filed by BLAI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Lease amendment, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons and Waiver of Service)(French, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAI, LLC v. Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAI, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Keith French
Represented By: Robert W. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory E. Bodin
Represented By: Christopher Michael Vitenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?