Brumfield v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al

Plaintiff: John Patrick Brumfield
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Ducane Gas Grills, Inc. and Weber-Stephen Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00293
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT Remanding Case to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish. Certified copy of this order sent to 20th Judicial District Court. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 OPINION Adopting #7 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This action is REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. The pending #6 Motion to Remand is denied as moot. Judgment shall entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this action be REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. It is further recommended that the pending #6 Motion to Remand be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (SWE)
June 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by John Patrick Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Maughan, Roy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Letter dated 5/30/2019 regarding #4 Order and Inability to Comply with Order by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Summer, Renee) Modified on 5/31/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/30/2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendant Weber-Stephen Products, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (SWE)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Parish of West Feliciana, Case Number 23352. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1940124), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Verification, #8 Corporate Disclosure, #9 Consent to Removal, #10 List of Parties, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summer, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrick Brumfield
Represented By: Namisha D. Patel
Represented By: Joshua David Roy
Represented By: Roy H. Maughan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Renee D. Summer
Represented By: Richard E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducane Gas Grills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber-Stephen Products, LLC
Represented By: Albert C. Miranda
Represented By: Thomas Hudson Barnett
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Represented By: Erin O'Brien Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?