Busch v. Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation

Plaintiff: Gayle T. Busch
Defendant: Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00302
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/28/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/10/19. (BKA)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/10/2019. (ELW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 8/9/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 2/14/2020. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 3/20/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 3/13/2020. Defendant's Expert Reports due by 4/17/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 6/15/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/9/2019. (KAH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by Gayle T. Busch. (Craft, Jill)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gayle T. Busch. Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Craft, Jill)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/14/2019. (KAH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1941406.), filed by Gayle T. Busch. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit Notice of Right to Sue, #4 Attachment Summons)(Craft, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busch v. Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roedel Parsons Koch Blache, Balhoff & McCollister, A Law Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle T. Busch
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?