Hotard et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn Hotard and Albert Hotard, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Baldwin and Sam's East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00304
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Martinez, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Answer , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to Petition for Damages by Sam's East, Inc.. (Matherne, Valerie) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit the text SWE).
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum Establishing Amount in Controversy as to #8 Order Set Deadlines, Memorandum Establishing Amount in Controversy filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 17, 2019 correspondence)(Matherne, Valerie) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit text (ELW).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By 6/20/2019 Defendant Sam's East, Inc. shall file memorandum and supporting evidence regarding amount in controversy. By 7/5/2019, Plaintiffs shall address the citizenship issue as set forth herein.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/6/2019. (SWE)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/20/2019. (ELW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of List of Pleadings in State Court by Sam's East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Petition for Damages, #2 Attachment Citation issued to Joseph Baldwin, #3 Attachment Citation issued to Sam's East, Inc., #4 Attachment Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, #5 Attachment Request for Notice, #6 Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court)(Matherne, Valerie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Sam's East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Motion to Substitute Pleading and Corrected Notice of Removal)(Matherne, Valerie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Sam's East, Inc.. (Matherne, Valerie)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with 2 at pp. 4-9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Sam's East, Inc.. (Matherne, Valerie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 681629. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1941499), filed by Sam's East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Matherne, Valerie) Modified on 5/16/2019 to replace as per rec doc 3 (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotard et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James M. Matherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Hotard
Represented By: Timothy J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Hotard, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?