Davis v. United States Army Reserve et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth S Davis
Defendant: Elizabeth Bohannon, William Norris and United States Army Reserve
Case Number: 3:2019cv00305
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 First MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Zachary, Chase)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by All Defendants. (ELW) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct file date (ELW).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of the United States' Motion to Stay Discovery. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 13-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of the United States' Motion to Stay Discovery . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of the United States' #5 Motion to Stay Discovery by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Zachary, Chase) Modified on 6/20/2019 to link the motions (KMW).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and denying as moot the MOTION to Withdraw/Substitute Pleading for the Same. The #9 Memorandum in Opposition to #5 Motion to Stay Discovery is now considered properly filed as is. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations and to Withdraw and Substitute Pleadings and Exhibits R-V . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations and to Withdraw and Substitute Pleadings and Exhibits R-V by Kenneth S Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; MEMO IN OPPOSITION, #2 Exhibit Exhibits R-V)(Winters, Anthony). Added MOTION to Substitute on 6/19/2019 (KMW).
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (KMW)
June 16, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Kenneth S Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-V Exhibits)(Winters, Anthony) Modified on 6/19/2019 to link the motions(KMW).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Opposition to #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Kenneth S Davis. (Winters, Anthony) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #4 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines. (LLH)
June 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 First MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: Before the Court is a #5 Motion to Stay Discovery (the "Motion") filed by the United States. Per the Motion, the United States seeks an ordering staying all discovery in this case pending resolution of the jurisdictional issues raised in the United States' #2 Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Remand. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within three (3) days of this Notice and Order, a Notice stating whether Plaintiff opposes the #5 Motion to Stay Discovery. In the event Plaintiff does oppose the #5 Motion to Stay Discovery, normal briefing delays with respect to the Motion shall apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
June 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Stay Discovery . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Zachary, Chase)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SPT OF MOTION to REMAND, #2 Exhibit INDEX TO EXHIBITS and EXHIBITS)(Winters, Anthony)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/14/2019. (KAH)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Elizabeth Bohannon)(Zachary, Chase)
May 14, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 682392. (), filed by Elizabeth Bohannon, William Norris, United States Army Reserve. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Index, #2 Exhibit B State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C Declaration Bohannon, #4 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Green, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States Army Reserve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth S Davis
Represented By: Michael LaShaun Tyler
Represented By: Anthony D Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Bohannon
Represented By: Katherine Krupa Green
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Norris
Represented By: Katherine Krupa Green
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Reserve
Represented By: Katherine Krupa Green
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?