White Hat et al v. Landry et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Theda Larson Wright, RISE St. James, Sharon Lavigne, Ramon Mejia, 350 New Orleans, Peter Aaslestad, Anne White Hat, Judith Larson Hernandez, Karen Savage and Alberta Larson Stevens
Defendant: Bo Duhe, Ronald J Theriot, Attorney General Jeff Landry and Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2019cv00322
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. Ronald J Theriot answer due 9/16/2019. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
July 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Joint MOTION to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time To File Responsive Pleadings by All Plaintiffs. (Spees, Pamela) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the text (KAH). M
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Bo Duhe waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Spees, Pamela)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Ronald J Theriot waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Spees, Pamela)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Jeff Landry waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Spees, Pamela)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting for good cause shown #14 Unopposed Ex Parte Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and #15 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time. Bo Duhe and Jeff Landry responsive pleadings due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 7/8/2019 (BLR).
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(St. John, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Adams, Glenn)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 9-1 with 11-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corrected Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel)(Spees, Pamela)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to FileResponsive Pleadings to the original Complaint. M. Bofill Duh, in his official capacity as District Attorney for the 16th Judicial District, State of Louisiana be and is hereby granted an additional extensionof time of four (4) days; that is, up to and including July 9, 2019, within which to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings, including but not limited to pleadings asserting Rule 12 defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1961509). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1961509) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Spees, Pamela) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/28/2019) (ELW). Modified on 6/28/2019 as granted by rec doc #11 (ELW).
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Alexis, Ralph)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, Attorney General Jeff Landry responsive pleadings due July 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive pleadings due by 7/5/2019 as to M. Bofill Duhe. (LLH)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. M. Bofill Duhe, in his official capacity as District Attorney forthe 16th Judicial District, State of Louisiana be and is hereby granted an extension of time oftwenty-one (21) days; that is, up to and including July 5, 2019, within which to file motions and/orother responsive pleadings, including but not limited to pleadings asserting Rule 12 defenses.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Alexis, Ralph)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/31/2019. (LLH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bo Duhe, Jeff Landry, Ronald J Theriot. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1945469.), filed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Duhe Summons, #3 Attachment Landry Summons, #4 Attachment Theriot Summons)(Spees, Pamela) (Attachment 1, 2, 3 and 4 replaced on 5/22/2019 to flatten the documents) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Hat et al v. Landry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Bucket Brigade
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Aaslestad
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Joseph
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theda Larson Wright
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RISE St. James
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lavigne
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Mejia
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 350 New Orleans
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Aaslestad
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne White Hat
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Larson Hernandez
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Savage
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Larson Stevens
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Duhe
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Margaret A. Collier
Represented By: Harry James Vorhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?