Debetaz, Jr. v. General Motors, LLC

Plaintiff: LARRY DEBETAZ and Larry D. Debetaz, Jr.
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00340
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Extend the Court's Deadline for Entry of Status Report. The Status Report shall be filed on or before 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend the Court's Deadline for Entry of Status Report by Larry D. Debetaz, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Ritch, Joseph) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED PETITION FOR DAMAGES against General Motors, LLC, filed by Larry D. Debetaz, Jr.(Ritch, Joseph) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 7/25/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant General Motors, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/16/2019. (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC.(Giffin, Carl) Modified on 7/15/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant General Motors LLC is granted an extension of 21 days from the time the pleading would otherwise be due to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (KAH)
June 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed order)(Giffin, Carl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC, filed by Larry D. Debetaz, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Ritch, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/18/2019 to flatten the document) (KMW).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 6/18/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant General Motors, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/12/2019. (SGO)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/4/2019. (SGO)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENERAL MOTORS LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number LAMDC-1949242.), filed by LARRY DEBETAZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ritch, Joseph) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/31/2019 to flatten the document) (SWE). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/4/2019) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debetaz, Jr. v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Giffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DEBETAZ
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Debetaz, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?