Cuevas v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Andre Cuevas and Paul A. Cuevas
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00349
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Trans Union, LLC.(Wilty, Reagan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Tucker, Madison)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Tucker, Madison)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, as substituted. Trans Union, LLC deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Substitute Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Trans Union, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall substitute R. Docs. 9-2 and 9-3 in the place of R. Docs. 6 and 6-1. The Clerk shall also substitute R. Doc. 9-4 in the place of R. Doc. 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC is granted an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days, or until 7/26/2019, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Substitute Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and #7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified on 7/1/2019 to link the motions (KMW).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Tucker, Madison)
June 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (Wilty, Reagan) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/10/2019 in accordance with RD 11) (SWE).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Main Document 6 and Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2019 in accordance with RD 11) (SWE).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul A. Cuevas. Trans Union, LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Ridge, Garth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul A. Cuevas. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Ridge, Garth)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/14/2019. (SGO)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1950949.), filed by Paul Andre Cuevas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Equifax, #3 Summons-TU)(Ridge, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Madison Tucker
Represented By: Christopher D. Cazenave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Andre Cuevas
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Cuevas
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?