Ricks v. Minor et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Defendant: Keith Minor and Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Staff
Case Number: 3:2019cv00399
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Documents (Motion to Appoint Counsel) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS. (Attachments: #1 local rule, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(EDC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Staff, Keith Minor. (Summons submitted to the USM for service.) (EDC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: USM is to serve the defendants wherever found. Within 90 days of the defendants' first appearance, the parties shall complete all discovery. Counsel for defendants shall provide to the plaintiff all medical records, etc. pertinent to the issues in this case, within 20 days of the defendants' first appearance. Discovery shall proceed as stated herein. Within 120 days of the defendant's first appearance, the parties shall file cross motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (EDC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (EDC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Wesley Ricks Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1. (Attachments: #1 local rule) (EDC)
June 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 18, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Wesley Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Staff, Keith Minor, filed by Wesley Ricks. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Minor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?