United Association Local 198 Pension Fund et al v. Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC
Plaintiff: United Association Local 198 Pension Fund, United Association Local 198 Education Fund, United Association Local 198 Annuity Fund, United Association Local 198 Welfare Fund and United Association Local Union No. 198
Defendant: Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00403
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Entry of Default. (EDC)
August 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Entry of Default . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement #5 Motion for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Christina) Modified on 8/9/2019 to link the motions (KMW).
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Christina)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Association Local 198 Pension Fund, United Association Local 198 Annuity Fund, United Association Local 198 Education Fund, United Association Local 198 Welfare Fund, United Association Local Union No. 198. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Carroll, Christina)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/16/2019. (SGO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC,(Filing Fee $400 Receipt Number ALAMDC-1959086) filed by United Association Local 198 Pension Fund, United Association Local 198 Annuity Fund, United Association Local 198 Education Fund, United Association Local 198 Welfare Fund, United Association Local Union No. 198. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Carroll, Christina) Modified on 6/20/2019 to enter payment information (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Association Local 198 Pension Fund et al v. Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local 198 Pension Fund
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local 198 Education Fund
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local 198 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local 198 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local Union No. 198
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Plumbing & Piping, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?