Yinerson, LLC v. Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yinerson, LLC
Defendant: NAVIS GPS,INC., Ana Lefort, CMA CGM (AMERICA), LLC and Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00407
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 is CANCELED in light of the pending motions to dismiss which raise issues regarding the Court's ability to exercise personal jurisdiction over certain defendants. The case will be reviewed in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its opposition to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) is extended until 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/6/2019. (KAH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by Yinerson, LLC. (Hair, Galen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ana Lefort. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Submitted (Hair, Galen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Submitted (Hair, Galen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Yinerson, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Hair, Galen) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) by Ana Lefort, Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Citation - Farmers Rice, #3 Exhibit Citation - Ana Lefort)(Scofield, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte/Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Filing to Correct Typographical Error. The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10-1) is substituted for the Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8). Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/18/2019. (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte/Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Filing to Correct Typographical Error by NAVIS GPS,INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Corrected "Motion to Dismiss", #2 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 7/15/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney T. Patrick OLeary regarding Brooke A. Riggs who is Co-Counsel for party Navis GPS, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by NAVIS GPS,INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 7/19/2019 to replace as per rec doc 11 (KAH).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/1/2019. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CMA CGM (AMERICA), LLC.(Waid, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Consent to Removal by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC (Scofield, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Ana Lefort (Scofield, Scott)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Galen M. Hair regarding David C. Spinner who is Co-Counsel for party Yinerson, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of to Parties of Joint Notice of Removal by CMA CGM (AMERICA), LLC, Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Waid, Raymond)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC for Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 682885. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1959697), filed by CMA CGM (AMERICA), LLC, Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Waid, Raymond) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yinerson, LLC v. Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIS GPS,INC.
Represented By: T. Patrick O'Leary
Represented By: Andrew S. de Klerk
Represented By: Brandon Kyle Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Lefort
Represented By: Phillip Wade DeVilbiss
Represented By: Scott James Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM (AMERICA), LLC
Represented By: Raymond T. Waid
Represented By: Randy Marse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Wade DeVilbiss
Represented By: Scott James Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yinerson, LLC
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?