Shown v. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Thomas Shown
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00423
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Shown. Nancy Berryhill served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Meunier, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action for judicial review of the administrative decision shall proceed in accordance with the schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/17/2019. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the US, Nancy Berryhill, US Attorney's Office. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendants. The plaintiff is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/17/2019. (KAH)
June 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by THOMAS SHOWN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment)(Meunier, Adam) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERRYHILL NANCY, filed by THOMAS SHOWN. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment)(Meunier, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shown v. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shown
Represented By: Adam M. Meunier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?