Chambers v. Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lynn Chambers
Defendant: Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Anco Insulations, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, The McCarty Corporation, Burmaster Land & Development Company, LLC and Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00447
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Burmaster Land & Development Company, LLC.(Webb, Kevin) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Mosaic Company for Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.. (Reid, Devin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.(Reid, Devin) Modified on 8/27/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Continue the Deadlines to Hold Rule 26(F) Scheduling Conference and File the Status Report. The Scheduling Conference originally set for 9/12/2019 is RESET for 10/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. A status report shall be filed on or before 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
August 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Joint MOTION to Continue the Deadlines to Hold Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and File the Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue the Deadlines to Hold Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and File the Status Report by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reid, Devin) Modified on 8/22/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. is granted an extension of time of 21 days, or until 8/26/2019, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney Scott C. Seiler regarding Brady M. Hadden who is Co-Counsel for party Mosaic Global Holdings Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
August 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, and Plaintiff's Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, and Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reid, Devin) Modified on 8/6/2019 to edit text (LLH).
August 3, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(McMillan, Sarah)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1653, that, on or before August 5, 2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendant, Burmaster Land & Development, LLC by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/26/2019. (EDC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (SGO)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc..(McMillan, Sarah) Modified on 7/19/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (McMillan, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-684688. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1966891), filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition for Damages, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMillan, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bradford Wilmore
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: Jacques Charles Mestayer
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burmaster Land & Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Webb
Represented By: Brett Foster Willie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Deirdre C. McGlinchey
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lynn Chambers
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Jeremiah Spencer Boling
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?