Taplette v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: Donovan R Taplette
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc, Vincent Knight, Uknown Whittaker, Shannon Dumars, Unknown Dawson, John Doe 2, John Coleman, Darrel Vannoy, John Doe 3, Uknown Catcher and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2019cv00448
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule by Donovan R Taplette. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Richthofen, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue and Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 is RESET for 10/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Status Report deadline is extended to 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
August 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Continue and Reset Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue and Reset Scheduling Conference by Shannon Dumars, Vincent Knight, James M. LeBlanc, Darrel Vannoy, Uknown Whittaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dobard, Kristian) Modified on 8/22/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (SGO)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute. The Clerk's Office is instructed to substitute the attached notice of removal and exhibits in place of the original filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute by Shannon Dumars, Vincent Knight, James M. LeBlanc, Darrel Vannoy, Uknown Whittaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Dobard, Kristian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Case Number 23535. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1967167), filed by Vincent Knight, Darrel Vannoy, Asst. Warden Whittaker, James M. LeBlanc, Shannon Dumars. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment, #24 Attachment, #25 Attachment, #26 Attachment, #27 Attachment)(Dobard, Kristian) Modified on 7/22/2019 to replace as per rec doc 3 (KAH). (Main Document 1, 2, and 3 replaced on 7/22/2019 in accordance with RD 3) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taplette v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Represented By: Kristian B Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Knight
Represented By: Kristian B Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Whittaker
Represented By: Kristian B Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Dumars
Represented By: Kristian B Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Kristian B Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Catcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan R Taplette
Represented By: Richard J. Richthofen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?