Verde v. DFRG Management, LLC
Defendant: Del Frisco's Restaurant Group, DFRG Management and DFRG Management, LLC.
Petitioner: Leonardo Verde
Case Number: 3:2019cv00456
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 and #8 Motions for Laura E. Grubb and James T. McBride to appear pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Laura E. Grubb to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989925), #8 MOTION for James T. McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989943). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for James T. McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989943) by DFRG Management, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration for James McBride, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for James McBride, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order for Motion for PHV for James McBride)(Payne, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Laura E. Grubb to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989925) by DFRG Management, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Grubb, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Grubb, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order for Motion for PHV for Grubb)(Payne, William)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel of Record. Sarah K. Lunn of the Shelby Law Firm, and Richard F. Zimmerman, of the McKernan Law Firm, are enrolled as additionalcounsel of record to represent Plaintiff, Leonardo Verde, in the above captioned matter. The motion is denied as to Stephanie L. Willis enrolling in the matter. Ms. Willis is not in compliance with Local Rule 83(b)(5) regarding annual fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report for good cause shown. Status Report is now due by 11/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report , #3 MOTION to Enroll Sarah K. Lunn, Stephanie L. Willis and Richard F. Zimmerman as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report by Leonardo Verde. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Shelby, Azelie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Enroll Sarah K. Lunn, Stephanie L. Willis and Richard F. Zimmerman as Additional Attorney by Leonardo Verde. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Shelby, Azelie)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2019. (KAH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1969029.), filed by Leonardo Verde. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Notice of Right to Sue)(Shelby, Azelie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verde v. DFRG Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Frisco's Restaurant Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFRG Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFRG Management, LLC.
Represented By: William H Payne, IV
Represented By: James T. McBride
Represented By: Laura E. Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonardo Verde
Represented By: Azelie Ziegler Shelby
Represented By: Richard F. Zimmerman, III
Represented By: Sarah Kimberly Lunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?