Franklin v. Bordelon et al
Plaintiff: Terry Franklin
Defendant: Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, Donnie Bordelon, Ashley C. Firmin, James Longino, Laura Desselle, Troy Poret, Nikki Chenevert, Jude Pitre and Diane Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00459
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Account by Terry Franklin. (KMW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Account by Terry Franklin. (KMW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donnie Bordelon, Nikki Chenevert, Laura Desselle, Ashley C. Firmin, James Longino, Jude Pitre, Troy Poret, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, Diane Williams, filed by Terry Franklin.(KMW)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 Letter of Deficiency, filed by Terry Franklin. (KMW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Letter of Deficiency, filed by Terry Franklin. (KMW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. Filing Fee due by 9/9/2019. Statement of Account due by 9/9/2019. (ELW)
July 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(EDC)
July 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 11, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donnie Bordelon, Ashley C. Firmin and Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, filed by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Bordelon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Laborde Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley C. Firmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Longino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Desselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jude Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?