Early et al v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Erica Early
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00461
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action for judicial review of the administrative decision shall proceed in accordance with the schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2019. (KAH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney General and US Attorney. Summons submitted to the USM for service (ELW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ELW)
July 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erica Early. (EDC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Erica Early. (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Early et al v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?