Bethely v. Vannoy et al
Petitioner: Richard Bethely
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00463
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Filing Fee due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/30/2019. (KAH)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Stay and Abey Habeas Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/30/2019. (KAH)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Account by Richard Bethely. (KMW)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Statement of Account due by 9/10/2019. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Stay, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 15, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay and Abey Habeas Petition by Richard Bethely. (EDC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Bethely. (EDC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richard Bethely. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 cover letter)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethely v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Bethely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?