United States of America v. Williams Olefins, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Williams Olefins, LLC and n
Case Number: 3:2019cv00465
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Approve Stipulation of Settlement by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gaupp, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Supplemental Briefs due by 9/20/2019 re: Stipulation of Settlement. Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3. If the parties wish to participate by video, contact courtroom deputy. (SWE) (SWE).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Peter Modlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Peter S. Modlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989046). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Peter S. Modlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1989046) by Williams Olefins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bell, Katie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Resetting Hearing: Hearing set for 8/28/19 is hereby CANCELED and a Telephone Conference is hereby set for 9/10/2019 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and all Parties shall be on the line when the call is made into Chambers. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/19/19. (BKA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Approve Stipulation of Settlement by Williams Olefins, LLC. (Bell, Katie)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Considering #3 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Stipulation of Settlement filed by United States of America Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM to address the fairness, adequacy, and reasonableness of the proposed "Stipulation of Settlement" in Courtroom 3. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/15/2019. (SWE)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Williams Olefins, LLC (Bell, Katie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Stipulation of Settlement by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Gaupp, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION of Settlement re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Gaupp, John) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Williams Olefins, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaupp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams Olefins, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Olefins, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Modlin
Represented By: Katie D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: n
Represented By: Peter S. Modlin
Represented By: Katie D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Represented By: Kirk W. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?