Gordon v. Vannoy et al
Petitioner: Curtis Gordon
Respondent: Darrell Vannoy, James M LeBlanc and Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2019cv00472
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #5 Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04, #4 Order. Mail returned from Curtis Gordon. Reason: Return to Court- Obstruction, Tampered with. (EDC)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be deemed successive, and that it be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction because Petitioner did not obtain permission from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit prior to filing. Petitioner's #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/26/2019. (EDC)
July 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Curtis Gordon Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5) (KMW)
July 16, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Curtis Gordon. (KMW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Curtis Gordon.(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?