Joseph v. Houston Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Joseph
Defendant: Bo Man Trucking, LLC, Larry Doss and Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00487
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 9/26/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2020. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 6/15/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 6/15/2020. Defendant's Expert Reports due by 7/15/2050. Discovery from Experts due by 8/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 9/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 2/26/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/19/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 3/26/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 - 4/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (KAH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT by Bo Man Trucking, LLC, Larry Doss, Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Rome, Curt)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (SWE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 682202. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1976027), filed by Bo Man Trucking, LLC, Larry Doss, Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3A, #7 Exhibit 3B, #8 Exhibit 3B#1, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 List of Parties, #11 List of State Court Pleadings, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of State Court Record, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 2 of State Court Record, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 3 of State Court Record, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 4 of State Court Record, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 5 of State Court Record, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 6 of State Court Record, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 7 of State Court Record)(Rome, Curt) (Attachment 4, 6 and 12 replaced on 7/25/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Houston Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Joseph
Represented By: Anne Marie Polk Muller
Represented By: Chet G. Boudreaux
Represented By: Richard F. Zimmerman, III
Represented By: Brad R. Matthews
Represented By: Douglas K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Man Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Doss
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?