Drawhorn-Davis v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Janice Drawhorn-Davis
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company and Yusuf Atkins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00496
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Janice Drawhorn-Davis. (Fruge', Michael)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Janice Drawhorn-Davis. Plaintiff may file a Reply Memorandum, not to exceed five pages, on or before 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
September 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Janice Drawhorn-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Fruge', Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Fruge', Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Thompson, Michael)
August 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Janice Drawhorn-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gay, Randall)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (EDC)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Tony Clayton regarding Brilliant P. Clayton who is Co-Counsel for party Janice Drawhorn-Davis. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 672,043. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1978446), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drawhorn-Davis v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Drawhorn-Davis
Represented By: Randall Gay, Jr
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge'
Represented By: Michael Charles Hendry
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Richard J Ward, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Mann Thompson
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusuf Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?