Hill et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hill and Derrick Stampley
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Daniel Taylor and TLK Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00499
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(DGM)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion to Withdraw and Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Grant Guillot is enrolled as co-counsel of record for defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, TLK Transportation, LLC, Daniel Taylor. The motion is denied as to the withdrawal of attorney Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux as she did not sign the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux to Withdraw as Attorney and enroll Grant Guillot and Justin A. Jack as Additional Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux to Withdraw as Attorney and enroll Grant Guillot and Justin A. Jack as Additional Counsel of Record by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, TLK Transportation, LLC, Daniel Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Mathews, Kellen)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 9/26/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 9/19/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2020. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 8/3/2020. Defendant's Expert Reports due by 9/3/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 11/4/2020. Motions shall be filed by 12/4/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/30/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/21/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/28/2021. Bench Trial set for 6/14/2021 - 6/18/2021 at 08:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (KAH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Lowe, Benjamin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (SWE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 681972. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1979021), filed by Daniel Taylor, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, TLK Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mathews, Kellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLK Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Kimberly Ulasiewicz Boudreaux
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hill
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Lowe
Represented By: Spencer H. Calahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Stampley
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Lowe
Represented By: Spencer H. Calahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?