Ray et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashely Surla Ray and Joshua Ray
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00514
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Separate Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Separate Status Report by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Defendant's Status Report)(Crosby, Michele)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc. for American Airlines, Inc... (Crosby, Michele)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Crosby, Michele)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until on or about September 9, 2019 to file an answer or other appropriate pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8-15-2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7(a) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crosby, Michele)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baton Rouge City Court, Case Number 19-04093-A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1982583), filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Citation and Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing)(Crosby, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Whitesell Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashely Surla Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?