Caillet v. Newman et al
Plaintiff: Linda V. Caillet
Defendant: Edward Jones, Heather Rosenthal and Daniel Newman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00515
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: IT IS ORDERED that a hearing be held in this case pursuant to Spears v. McCotter, 766 F.2d 179 (5th Cir. 1985), to determine whether all or any part of this case should be dismissed as frivolous. Plaintiff is required to attend this hearing personally. Failure to attend this hearing may result in dismissal of the plaintiff's case without further notice. Spears Hearing set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. A notice was sent by certified mail to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2019. (KAH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit(s) to #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda V. Caillet. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KMW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof. The Clerk's Office shall not issue service of process unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2019. (EDC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit(s) to #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 MOTION to Vacate by Linda V. Caillet (KMW)
August 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda V. Caillet. (EDC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award from Expungement by Linda V. Caillet. (EDC)
August 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caillet v. Newman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda V. Caillet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?