Broussard v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College et al
Plaintiff: Myra Broussard
Defendant: Amy Westbrook, Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College and Roland Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00527
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Notice of Removal by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College, Roland Mitchell, Amy Westbrook. (Archey, Connell) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMITTAL OF DISQUALIFICATION: This Notice of Remittal of Disqualification affords the parties and their lawyers the opportunity to discuss whether they are willing to agree in writing that Judge Wilder-Doomes should not be disqualified from participating in this matter. If all parties and counsel agree Judge Wilder-Doomes should not be disqualified, they shall jointly file with the court a Notice to that effect. The Notice should be signed by each party as well as the partys attorney and filed with the Court by no later than September 20, 2019. Notice due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/03/2019. (ELW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College, Roland Mitchell and Amy Westbrook responsive pleadings due 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College, Roland Mitchell, Amy Westbrook. (Archey, Connell)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/14/2019. (EDC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, EBR, LA, Case Number 685585. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1984743), filed by Roland Mitchell, Amy Westbrook, Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment List of State Court Pleadings, #3 Attachment List of All Counsel)(Archey, Connell) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Westbrook
Represented By: Julie Moffett McCall
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and A & M College
Represented By: Julie Moffett McCall
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Mitchell
Represented By: Julie Moffett McCall
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Broussard
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?