Cooper v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Cooper
Defendant: Trevor Wilson, Valley Equipment Limited and Northbridge Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00528
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by Shawn Cooper. (Vasquez, Jessica)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Northbridge Financial Corporation, Valley Equipment Limited, Trevor Wilson.(Molina, Ross)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/15/2019. (ELW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 1045113. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1984880), filed by Trevor Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Molina, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Cooper
Represented By: Jessica M. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Wilson
Represented By: Ross Michael Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Equipment Limited
Represented By: Ross Michael Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northbridge Financial Corporation
Represented By: Ross Michael Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?