Iheanacho v. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Plaintiff: Rachel Iheanacho
Defendant: Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00532
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 SURREPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rachel Iheanacho. (SWE)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Rachel Iheanacho. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of its Memorandum to #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (SWE)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Rachel Iheanacho. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Surreply Memorandum)(Wilson, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Reply, #2 Proposed Pleading; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration, #3 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply)(Griffitts, Ryan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rachel Iheanacho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit La. Sec. of State record)(Wilson, Scott)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Griffitts, Ryan) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit text (ELW).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Iheanacho. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Wilson, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/19/2019. (ELW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand Against Air Liquide Large Industries US LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1985917.), filed by Rachel Iheanacho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Summons)(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 8/16/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iheanacho v. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Iheanacho
Represented By: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Represented By: Ryan Griffitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?