Baker v. Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey Baker
Defendant: Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00536
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Corey Baker. Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (DeReus, Garret)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc..(Andrishok, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2019. (SWE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 There is no document 3. Entered in error.
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1986559.), filed by Corey Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bizer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brew-Bachers of Baton Rouge VI, Inc.
Represented By: David Clayton Fleshman
Represented By: John T. Andrishok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Baker
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?