Stewart et al v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart and Bingham Stewart
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00540
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Balhoff, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Peacocke, Lee)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corporation for United Property & Casualty Insurance Company.. (Peacocke, Lee)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-685036. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1986896), filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #5 List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action)(Peacocke, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Balhoff
Represented By: John W. Perry, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Perry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bingham Stewart
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Balhoff
Represented By: John W. Perry, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Perry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Morgan Peacocke
Represented By: Leslie Elizabeth Knowles
Represented By: Kyle Anderson
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?