Evans v. East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Plaintiff: Keith Anthony Evans and Keith A Evans
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Case Number: 3:2019cv00542
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadlines. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Status Report is extended to 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION To Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION To Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadlines by Keith A Evans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2019 to edit text (LT). Modified on 10/3/2019 (SGO).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 In light of there being no opposition, and also in light of the waiver of service, the #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is granted to the extent that an answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 11/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorneys Robert L. Hammonds, Pamela Wescovich Dill, and Melissa Losch are enrolled as counsel for defendant East Baton Rouge Parish School System replacing Taylor J. Crousillac, Karleen J. Green, and Michael B. Victorian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith A Evans. East Baton Rouge Parish School System waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Schmidt, Robert)
September 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Melissa Losch, Pamela Dill, John Blanchard in place of Karleen Green, Michael Victorian, Taylor Crousillac as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Melissa Losch, Pamela Dill, John Blanchard in place of Karleen Green, Michael Victorian, Taylor Crousillac as Attorney by East Baton Rouge Parish School System. (Crousillac, Taylor)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: This matter having been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., the Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 is reset for 10/16/2019 at 9:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report remains due by 10/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
September 17, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
September 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by East Baton Rouge Parish School System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Victorian, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons executed upon East Baton Rouge Parish School System on 08/27/2019 by Personal (Smith, J.) Modified on 8/28/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to East Baton Rouge Parish School System. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Schmidt, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/21/2019. (EDC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Anthony Evans ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1987659.), filed by Keith Anthony Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Anthony Evans
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A Evans
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Represented By: Karleen Joseph Green
Represented By: Taylor James Crousillac
Represented By: Pamela Wescovich Dill
Represented By: Michael B. Victorian
Represented By: Robert L. Hammonds
Represented By: Melissa Losch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?