West, et al v. City of New Roads et al
Plaintiff: King Jeriah West, Mr. Darius R West and Darius West
Defendant: Officer John Doe, City of New Roads and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00544
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of New Roads, John Doe. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (EDC)
September 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darius West. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Fields, Monique) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/30/2019) (EDC). Modified on 9/30/2019 to flatten document. (EDC).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall pay $400.00, the full amount of the Courts filing fee, or file a Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days shall result in the dismissal of the plaintiffs Complaint without further notice from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (SGO)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Order for MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darius West. (Fields, Monique) Modified on 9/6/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darius R West.(Fields, Monique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West, et al v. City of New Roads et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Jeriah West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Darius R West
Represented By: Monique H. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius West
Represented By: Monique H. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?