Scott v. Security Plan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dionne Scott
Defendant: Security Plan Life Insurance Company, Paul Lagraize and Security Plan Fire Insurance Company of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00559
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 10/24/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/24/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/14/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 3/16/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 5/29/2020. Motions shall be filed by 7/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/23/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/14/2020. trial briefs due by 12/21/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/4/2021 to 1/6/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (SWE)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot 14 First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report. The motion has been struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10-18-2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Strike 13 Status Report, 14 First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report (to Add Full Signature Blocks) . The Clerk's Office shall strike R. Docs. 13 and 14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10-18-2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
October 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 13 Status Report, 14 First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report (to Add Full Signature Blocks) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff and Defendants by All Defendants. (Huval, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 13 Status Report, 14 First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report (to Add Full Signature Blocks) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order for Motion to Strike)(Huval, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 14 First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report (to Add Full Signature Blocks) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report (to Add Full Signature Blocks) by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Doc 13 Status Report)(Huval, Thomas) Modified on 10/18/2019 STRICKEN as ordered by rec doc 17(ELW).
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First STATUS REPORT filed Jointly by Plaintiff and Defendants by All Defendants. (Huval, Thomas) Modified on 10/18/2019 STRICKEN as ordered by rec doc 17 (ELW).
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint Letter to EEOC)(James, Kevin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss by Paul Lagraize, Security Plan Life Insurance Company re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Huval, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order of Dismissal)(Huval, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Paul Lagraize answer due 9/19/2019; Security Plan Life Insurance Company answer due 9/19/2019. (LLH)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings or other appropriate filing on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Substitute Pleadings to Correct Caption. The Clerk's Office shall substitute the following: R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 4, pages 1 - 11; R. Doc. 2 with R. Doc. 4-3; R. Doc. 3 with R. Doc. 4-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order for Motion for Extension)(Huval, Thomas) Modified on 8/30/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Pleadings to Correct Caption . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Pleadings to Correct Caption by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order to Substitute Pleadings to Correct Caption, #2 Attachment Notice of Removal-Corrected Caption, #3 Attachment Notice to Adverse Party-Corrected Caption, #4 Attachment List of All Parties Remaining in This Action-Corrected Caption)(Huval, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of List of All Parties Remaining in This Action by Security Plan Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Huval, Thomas) Modified on 9/3/2019 to replace document as per rec doc 7 (KAH).
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Adverse Parties by Security Plan Life Insurance Company (Huval, Thomas) Modified on 8/23/2019 to edit text (LLH). Modified on 9/3/2019 to replace as per rec doc 7 (KAH).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC Ascension Parish, Case Number 126148. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1990091), filed by Security Plan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A-State Court Pleadings, #3 Affidavit Ex B-Declaration of Jim Eliasberg)(Huval, Thomas) Modified on 9/3/2019 to replace documents as per rec doc 7 (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Security Plan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Plan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas H. Huval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lagraize
Represented By: Thomas H. Huval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Plan Fire Insurance Company of Louisiana
Represented By: Thomas H. Huval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Scott
Represented By: Kevin Lovell James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?