Arnold vs. United Financial Casualty Company, et al
Plaintiff: Jenea Arnold
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, Jimenez Clemente and JPM Trucking
Case Number: 3:2019cv00563
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jenea Arnold. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand be GRANTED, and the action be REMANDED to the 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the parties shall bear their own costs incurred as a result of the instant removal. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (SWE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending Motion to Remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 is CANCELLED. The parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. at 225-389-3602 upon a ruling on the motion, should a conference need to be reset. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Jenea Arnold. (Fruge', Michael)
September 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Jenea Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fruge', Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by United Financial Casualty Company.(Salgado, Marco)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Tony Clayton regarding Brilliant P. Clayton who is Co-Counsel for party Jenea Arnold. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
August 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of All Parties Remaining in this Action by United Financial Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Salgado, Marco)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Financial Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for United Financial Casualty Company.. (Salgado, Marco)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 685318. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1990861), filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Pleading; Certificate of Compliance)(Salgado, Marco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold vs. United Financial Casualty Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Marco Jose Salgado
Represented By: David A. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimenez Clemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPM Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenea Arnold
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge'
Represented By: Gracella Gail Simmons
Represented By: Michael Charles Hendry
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?