Young v. Landry
Petitioner: Leslie Young
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2019cv00583
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER to USCA: IT IS ORDERED that the petition be construed in part as a motion for authorization for the district court to consider the successive claims raised herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition be and hereby is transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit under the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1631 for that court to determine whether petitioner is authorized under 28 U. S. C. 2244 (b) to file the instant habeas corpus petition in this district court. See, In re: Tony Epps, 127 F.3d 364 (5th Cir. 1997). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/25/2019. (EDC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Leslie Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Supplemental Documents by Leslie Young (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment)(KMW)
September 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #1 MOTION to Obtain Authorization to File a Successive Writ of Habeas Corpus. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 5, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Obtain Authorization to File a Successive Writ of Habeas Corpus by Leslie Young. (KMW)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leslie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?