Dugas v. The Neuromedical Center Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC
Plaintiff: Jade Dugas
Defendant: THE NEUROMEDICAL CENTER REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00591
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Jade Dugas. (Arruebarrena, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: This matter having been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., the Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 2:30 PM in chambers shall be held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Status Report remains due by 10/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
October 2, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Neuromedical Center Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC (Zimmerman, Richard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by The Neuromedical Center Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC.(Zimmerman, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Neuromedical Center Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Arruebarrena, James)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/10/2019. (SWE)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against THE NEUROMEDICAL CENTER REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1997729.), filed by Jade Dugas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arruebarrena, James) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit text (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugas v. The Neuromedical Center Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Dugas
Represented By: James L. Arruebarrena
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEUROMEDICAL CENTER REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Aaron Hataway
Represented By: Richard Franklin Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?