United States of America v. Grigsby et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Barbara F Grigsby and Leonard L Grigsby
Case Number: 3:2019cv00596
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Barbara F. Grigsby and Leonard L. Grigsby answer due 11/15/2019. (Strandjord, James) Modified to edit text on 10/24/2019 (BLR).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/20/2019. (KAH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Leonard L Grigsby. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barbara F Grigsby. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by United States of America (Zachary, Chase)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Leonard Grigsby, #3 Summons - Barbara Grigsby)(Zachary, Chase)
September 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Grigsby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara F Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard L Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Represented By: James M. Strandjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?