Williams v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Plaintiff: Otis Williams, Sr.
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corp., Johnson & Johnson, Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc., Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Holding America, Inc. and Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00608
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Return on Electronic Transfer from District of New Jersey. (SWE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to New Jersey. (ELW)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ELW)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. The removing Defendants are allowed an additional extension of time up to, through and until twenty-one (21) days after the case is transferred to the MDL or the JPML issues a decision granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (EDC)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ELW)
September 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc. with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: State Court Pleadings)(Rookard, Kelly)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Substitute Record Document No. 1. The Clerk's Office is instructed to substitute R. Doc. 5-1 in the place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
September 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (to correct caption) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (to correct caption) by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal with corrected caption, #2 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Keelus Miles regarding Skyler Williams who is Co-Counsel for party Otis Williams, Sr.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Holdings America, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi Chemical Holdings Corporation for Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc. ; Other Affiliate OMJ PR Holdings for Janssen Ortho LLC; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Other Affiliate Centocor Research & Development, Inc. for Janssen Research & Development, LLC.. (Rookard, Kelly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Parish of Ascension, Case Number 125308. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2000416), filed by Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A: Petition for Damages)(Rookard, Kelly) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/17/2019) (ELW). Modified on 9/17/2019 as ordered by rec doc 6 (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanabe Research Laboratories U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Holding America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Development America, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Williams, Sr.
Represented By: Keelus Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?