Louis Smith v. McDermott Inc. and Chicago Bridge & Iron, LLC
Plaintiff: Louis Smith
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron, LLC and McDermott Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00613
Filed: September 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/9/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Louis Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louis Smith. McDermott Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Bohrer, Philip)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louis Smith. Chicago Bridge & Iron, LLC waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Bohrer, Philip)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/20/2019. (EDC)
September 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2000797.), filed by Louis Smith, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bohrer, Philip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2019) (EDC). Modified on 9/16/2019 to flatten document. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis Smith v. McDermott Inc. and Chicago Bridge & Iron, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Smith
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?